Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978347

EP0978347 - Method for manufacturing a rotationally symmetric, metallic composite body and outer rotor for wheel motor manufactured by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FÜRSTLICH HOHENZOLLERNSCHE WERKE LAUCHERTHAL GMBH & CO.
Hohenzollernstrasse 1
D-72517 Sigmaringendorf-Laucherthal / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Schweizer, Bernhard
Laizer Öschle 33
72517 Sigmaringendorf / DE
02 / Piefke, Ulrich
Ob den Garten 26
88374 Hosskirch / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113562.507.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE1998103584707.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835847
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978347
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978347
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23P15/00, B23P11/00, H02K15/00, H02K7/16
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/34]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines rotationssymmetrischen, metallischen Verbundkörpers und mit diesem Verfahren hergestellter Aussenläufer für einen Radmotor[2000/06]
English:Method for manufacturing a rotationally symmetric, metallic composite body and outer rotor for wheel motor manufactured by this method[2000/06]
French:Procédé de fabrication d' un corps composite metallique, symétrique en rotation et rotor extérieur pour moteur à roue fabriqué par ce procédé[2000/06]
Examination procedure30.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
19.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
01.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE880350  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 4-8;
 [A]DE877033  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,4-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE1563041  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1904413  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]US2998638  (MACLAREN FREDERICK B) [A] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 7; figure - *;
 [A]US3371410  (HENRY GINTOVT) [A] 1,9,10 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 13; figure - *;
 [A]DE704085  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 2 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5398404  (MEYER JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 1, line 17 - line 23 *