Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971451

EP0971451 - Modular high speed connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]For all designated states
FCI
145/147 rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
FCI
Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International
Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.
Helftheuvelweg 11
5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL
Inventor(s)01 / van Zanten, Albertus
Bijsteren 57, 5235
DP's - Hertogenbosch / NL
02 / Paagman, Bernardus L.F.
van Beverwijkstraat 36
5481 RX Schijndel / NL
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Regi, François-Xavier
FCI
Département Propriété Industrielle
145/147, rue Yves Le Coz
78035 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Regi, François-Xavier
FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz
78035 Versailles / FR
Former [2005/16]Regi, François-Xavier
FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz
F-78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2000/02]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113597.109.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011357910.07.1998         Original published format: US 113579
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971451
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971451
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971451
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/514, H01R12/16
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Modularer Verbinder für hohe Übertragungsgeschwindigkeiten[2000/02]
English:Modular high speed connector[2000/02]
French:Connecteur modulaire à grande vitesse[2000/02]
Examination procedure25.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
30.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.05.2005Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
09.06.2005Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
15.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2006Fee for grant paid
21.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
CY24.05.2006
FR24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
LU09.07.2006
IE10.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
GB24.08.2006
GR25.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/36]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
LU09.07.2006
IE10.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
GB24.08.2006
GR25.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2008/21]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
IE10.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
GB24.08.2006
GR25.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2008/16]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
IT24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
IE10.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
GB24.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/30]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
IE10.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/21]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
MC31.07.2006
DK24.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/18]AT24.05.2006
BE24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
NL24.05.2006
DK24.08.2006
ES04.09.2006
PT24.10.2006
Former [2007/03]AT24.05.2006
CH24.05.2006
LI24.05.2006
ES04.09.2006
Former [2007/02]AT24.05.2006
ES04.09.2006
Former [2006/50]ES04.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0442643  (GORE W L & ASS UK [GB]) [X] 1-9,15 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 14 *;
 [X]WO9747058  (BERG TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * page 8; figure 4 *;
 [X]EP0654859  (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [X] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 29 *;
 [XP]EP0918376  (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [XP] 1-9,15 * column 3 - column 8 *;
 [X]FR2387535  (BUNKER RAMO [US]) [X] 10-14 * page 3 - page 5 *;
 [X]DE2628167  (HARTING ELEKTRO W) [X] 10-14 * page 4 - page 5 *;
 [X]DE1487407  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 10-14 * page 7, line 14 - page 10, line 5 *;
 [X]DE19613264  (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]) [X] 10-14 * column 2, line 51 - column 6, line 58 *;
 [X]US3155449  (HENSCHEN HOMER E) [X] 10-14 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 44 *