Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974609

EP0974609 - Sulfur containing isocyanate compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Markusch, Peter H.
111 Lynbrook Drive
McMurray, PA 15317 / US
02 / MacNaughtan, Donald Jr.
1234 Robin Drive
New Martinsville, EV 26155 / US
03 / Crabtree, William G.
17 Lyle Road
Wheeling, WV 26003 / US
04 / Cline, Robert L.
302 West Madison
Paden City, WV 26159 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Perchenek, Nils , et al
Bayer AG KB-RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Perchenek, Nils, Dr. , et al
Bayer AG KB-RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99113617.712.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012137423.07.1998         Original published format: US 121374
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974609
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974609
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/70, C08K3/06, C08L75/04
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Schwefelhaltige Isocyanatzusammensetzungen[2000/04]
English:Sulfur containing isocyanate compositions[2000/04]
French:Compositions d'isocyanate contenant du soufre[2000/04]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
24.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2002Fee for grant paid
21.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
FI12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
LU12.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
MC01.02.2003
[2006/44]
Former [2004/40]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
FI12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
LU12.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2004/39]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
LU12.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2004/10]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/46]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
DK12.09.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/42]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
IE12.07.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/21]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
PT16.09.2002
Former [2003/20]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
GR12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2003/16]AT12.06.2002
CH12.06.2002
LI12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2003/10]AT12.06.2002
SE12.09.2002
Former [2002/49]SE12.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5538531  (HUDSON ALICE P [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4081429  (WYMAN RANSOME J, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 22 - line 27 *;
 [A]GB2088394  (NAPHTACHIMIE SA) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 15 - line 20; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO9609267  (DETRICK JOHN H [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1; claim 1 *