Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973069

EP0973069 - Apparatus for processing and monitoring photolithographic substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]Monitoring apparatus and method particularly useful in photolithographically processing substrates
[2015/16]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.01.2016  [2016/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nova Measuring Instruments Limited
P O Box 266, Kiryat Weizmann
Rehovot 76100 / IL
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Dishon, Giora
3 Mishol Uzrad Street
Jerusalem 97277 / IL
02 / Finarov, Moshe
4/25 Shkolnik Street
Rehovot 76209 / IL
03 / Cohen, Yoel
8/15 Anilevitch Street
Ness Ziona 74037 / IL
04 / Nirel, Zvi
127 Halilach Street
Mevasseret Zion 90805 / IL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113644.114.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateIL1998012533714.07.1998         Original published format: IL 12533798
US1998018472702.11.1998         Original published format: US 184727
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973069
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973069
Date:04.10.2006
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20, G03F7/30, H01L21/00
[2006/40]
Former International [2000/03]G03F7/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Behandlung und Kontrolle von photolithographischen Substraten[2015/16]
English:Apparatus for processing and monitoring photolithographic substrates[2015/16]
French:Appareil de traitement et de contrôle de substrats photolithographiques.[2015/16]
Former [2000/03]Kontrollgerät und photolithographisches Verfahren zur Behandlung von Substraten
Former [2000/03]Monitoring apparatus and method particularly useful in photolithographically processing substrates
Former [2000/03]Appareil de contrôle et méthode de traitement de substrats par voie photolithographique
Examination procedure26.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
21.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/04]
10.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200911   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US5393624  (USHIJIMA MITSURU [JP]) [X] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5695564  (IMAHASHI ISSEI [JP]) [X] 1-35 * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 63 *;
 [X]US4900939  (AOYAMA MASAAKI [JP]) [X] 36,37,40,41 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0793147  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 36-41 * column 6 *;
 [A]EP0456479  (CANON KK [JP])