blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973150

EP0973150 - Ultrasonic transducer and method for its manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Iskraemeco, Merjenje in Upravljanje Energije, D.D.
Savska loka 4
4000 Kranj / SI
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Zajec, Damir
Janeza Puharja 10
4000 Kranji / SI
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113647.414.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateSI1998000020316.07.1998         Original published format: SI 9800203
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973150
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973150
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:G10K9/122, B06B1/06, G10K11/02
[2002/47]
CPC:
G01F1/662 (EP); B06B1/0648 (EP); G01N29/245 (EP);
G10K11/02 (EP); G01N2291/02836 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/03]G10K9/122
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/32]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ultraschallwandler und das Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2000/03]
English:Ultrasonic transducer and method for its manufacturing[2000/03]
French:Transducteur à ultrason et procédé de la fabrication[2000/03]
Examination procedure11.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
28.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
15.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5274296  (HIKI SUSUMU ET AL) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 53; figure 2 *;
 [Y]JPH01246998  ;
 [A]US4523122  (TONE MASAYUKI ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph L *;
 [XA]DE4142372  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 4 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 56; figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]US4385255  (YAMAGUCHI KEIKI ET AL) [A] 2,5 * column 5, line 48 *;
 [A]US5637800  (DOUGLAS STEPHEN J ET AL) [A] 3,4,6 * column 6, paragraph 2; figure 4 * * column 7, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891222), vol. 013, no. 584, Database accession no. (E - 866), & JP01246998 A 19891002 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.