Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977406

EP0977406 - Circuit for transmission of galvanically isolated digital signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENDRESS + HAUSER WETZER GmbH + Co. KG
Obere Wank 1
87484 Nesselwang / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]For all designated states
ENDRESS + HAUSER WETZER GmbH + Co. KG
Obere Wank 1
D-87484 Nesselwang / DE
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Endress + Hauser Wetzer GmbH + Co. KG
Obere Wank 1
D-87484 Nesselwang / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Konrad, Stephan, Dipl.-Ing.
Kirchenweg 5
87669 Rieden a.F. / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Andres, Angelika Maria , et al
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG
PatServe
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]Andres, Angelika Maria , et al
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
Former [2000/05]Andres, Angelika
PatServ-Zentrale Patentabteilung, Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Postfach 2222
79574 Weil/Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date99113684.715.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateEP1998011333417.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98113334
US19980109786P25.11.1998         Original published format: US 109786 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977406
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977406
Date:23.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/02, H04L5/16
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zum galvanisch getrennten Übertragen von Digitalsignalen[2000/05]
English:Circuit for transmission of galvanically isolated digital signals[2000/05]
French:Circuit de transmission de signaux numériques avec séparation galvanique[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
29.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2009Fee for grant paid
02.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.12.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.09.2009
DK23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]CY23.09.2009
DK23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
NL23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/28]CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/19]CY23.09.2009
FI23.09.2009
SE23.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9837672  (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [PX] 1,3-13 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 9 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 24 * * page 9, line 6 - page 11, line 27 *;
 [X]US5384808  (VAN BRUNT ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 28 * * claim - *;
 [DXA]EP0198263  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [DX] 1,3,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 18 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 25 * * claims 1-5 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,4-9,11-13;
 [X]DE2555045  (HARTMANN & BRAUN AG) [X] 3,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29514238U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 3,4 * claims 1-5 *;
 [DA]WO8912366  (DAU GES M B H & CO KG [AT]) [DA] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 2 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]DE3614832  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5627480  (YOUNG STEVEN P [US], et al) [A] 3-5 * abstract * * claim - *;
 [A]US5418933  (KIMURA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 3-5 * abstract * * claim - *
by applicantDE3614832
 WO8912366