Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976581

EP0976581 - Clamping device for rail vehicles and corresponding fixing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schrey & Veit GmbH
Zotzenheimer Strasse 42
55576 Sprendlingen / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Veit, Günther
Nostadtstrasse 77
55411 Bingen / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Barth, Stephan Manuel
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Barth, Stephan Manuel
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Gbr, Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113692.016.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813226617.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832266
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976581
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976581
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976581
Date:29.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60B17/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Einspannvorrichtung für Schienenräder und entsprechendes Einspannverfahren[2000/05]
English:Clamping device for rail vehicles and corresponding fixing method[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de fixation pour roues ferroviaires et méthode correspondante pour fixer[2000/05]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
28.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2003Fee for grant paid
25.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
GB29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
PT29.03.2004
LU16.07.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
GB29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
LU16.07.2004
Former [2005/23]FI29.10.2003
GB29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
LU16.07.2004
Former [2004/46]FI29.10.2003
GB29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/45]FI29.10.2003
GB29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
DK29.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/40]FI29.10.2003
IE29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI29.10.2003
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE29.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE3120068  (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,13 * page 10, paragraph 2 * * abstract *;
 [DA]DE8313568U  (KLOEKNER-WERKE AG) [DA] 1,13 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [DA]DE3316759  (KLOECKNER WERKE AG) [DA] 1,13 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 48 * * abstract *
by applicantEP0047385
 DE8114906U
 DE8313568U
 DE3120068
 DE3243028
 DE3316759
 DE19542342
 DE19617684
 DE3113268
 DE4343008
 DE4337162
 DE4442779
 DE29807872U