Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972493

EP0972493 - Ultrasonic trocar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2004/06]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD
4-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishikawa, Manabu, c/o Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intell. Prop. & Legal Dept., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Okada, Mitsumasa, c/o Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intell. Prop. & Legal Dept., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99113731.613.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020196416.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20196498
JP1999009511201.04.1999         Original published format: JP 9511299
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972493
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972493
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972493
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/48]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ultraschalltrokar[2000/03]
English:Ultrasonic trocar[2000/03]
French:Trocar ultrasonique[2000/03]
Examination procedure13.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2005Fee for grant paid
28.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5728130  (ISHIKAWA MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,8,11,29,34 * column 10, line 15 - line 23; figure 12 * * column 10, line 50 - line 51 *;
 [A]US5472447  (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [A] 1,4,8,11 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 21 *;
 [X]US5445142  (HASSLER JR WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 20 * column 7, line 10 - line 29; figure 4 *;
 [X]US4545374  (JACOBSON ROBERT E [US]) [X] 20 * column 10, line 12 - line 23; figures 14,15 *;
 [X]US5776112  (STEPHENS RANDY R [US], et al) [X] 20 * column 4, line 32 - line 35 * * column 4, line 47 - line 49; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5263937  (SHIPP JOHN I [US]) [A] 21 * column 5, line 32 - line 61 *;
 [XA]US5359996  (HOOD LARRY L [US]) [X] 22-24,26,29-31 * column 5, line 24 - line 54 * * column 6, line 10 - line 39 * [A] 32,33;
 [XA]US5342380  (HOOD LARRY L [US]) [X] 22,23,26,29-31 * column 6, line 33 - line 45; figure 3 * [A] 32,33;
 [A]US5123903  (QUAID JOEL K [US], et al) [A] 34 * column 6, line 11 - line 30 *
ExaminationUS4654030
by applicantUS5314417
 US5267965