Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992886

EP0992886 - Method and device for determining the energy of a signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micronas GmbH
Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19
79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
[2008/51]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Micronas GmbH
Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19
79108 Freiburg / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Micronas Intermetall GmbH
Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19
79108 Freiburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vierthaler, Matthias
Blasiusstrasse 2
79108 Freiburg / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2000/15]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date99113742.314.07.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814678710.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846787
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992886
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992886
Date:26.05.2004
[2004/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992886
Date:17.12.2008
Language:DE
[2008/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/544, G01R19/02, G01R19/25
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2005/07]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestimmen der Energie eines Signals[2000/15]
English:Method and device for determining the energy of a signal[2000/15]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détermination de l'énergie d'un signal[2000/15]
Examination procedure21.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
03.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2008Fee for grant paid
05.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US4757467  (DIETERICH CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 32 - line 41 * * column 3, line 28 - line 59 *;
 [A]EP0862060  (FLUKE CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,8,9 * figures 1,6 * * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 45 *;
 [A]DE19613736  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,8,9 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 3, line 23 - line 33 *