Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977213

EP0977213 - Actuator for electromagnetic valve drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2000
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.08.2000 [2000/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Nagel, Michael
Kaeppelstrasse 8
90491 Nürnberg / DE
02 / Gramann, Matthias
Leuzenberger Strasse 2
91233 Neunkirchen a.d.S. / DE
03 / Röckl, Thomas
Prof.-Stark-Strasse 21
92271 Freihung / DE
04 / Wilczek, Rudolf
Haidweg 11
90518 Altdorf / DE
05 / Orthmann, Reinhard, Dr.
Auf der Burg 22
55130 Mainz / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Kolb, Georg
Daimler AG
Intellectual Property Management
IPM, C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Kolb, Georg
Daimler-Benz AG, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date99113752.214.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813410929.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834109
DE199912441727.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19924417
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977213
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F7/16, F01L9/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Aktor zur elektromagnetischen Ventilsteuerung[2000/05]
English:Actuator for electromagnetic valve drive[2000/05]
French:Actionneur pour commande électromagnétique de soupape[2000/05]
Examination procedure24.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
05.07.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/35]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19751609  (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0793004  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 4 *;
 [A]DE29712502U  (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 5 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 31 *;
 [A]FR2196605  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US])