Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987485

EP0987485 - Device for winding an anticorrosion tape on a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO-Holding GmbH & Co.
Felderstrasse 24
51371 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Konkol, Günther
Kalkstrasse 139
51377 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Langmaack, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte
Maxton & Langmaack
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99113817.315.07.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateDE199814253117.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19842531
[2000/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987485
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987485
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/18, B65H81/08, F16L58/16
[2001/22]
Former International [2000/12]F16L55/18, B65H81/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2002/08]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Bewickeln eines Rohrstranges mit Korrosionsschutzband[2000/12]
English:Device for winding an anticorrosion tape on a pipe[2000/12]
French:Dispositif pour enrouler de tuyau avec une band anti-corrosion[2000/12]
Examination procedure18.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
07.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5417786  (DENMAN GEORGE W [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 47 * * column 6, line 32 - column 6, line 64; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4069088  (COTTAM SPENCER D) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 56 - column 6, line 61; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US2302196  (DOWNS JESSE S, et al) [A] 1,6 * page 1, column R, line 15 - page 1, column R, line 45; figure 1 *