Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972603

EP0972603 - Wire electric discharge machining apparatus, wire electric discharge machining method, and mold for extrusion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hironaga, Masayuki, c/o NGK Yagoto-ryo
150, Omoteyama 3 chome, Tenpaku-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-pref.468-0069 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113843.915.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020202516.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20202598
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972603
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972603
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972603
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23H9/00, B28B3/20, B23H7/36
[2000/52]
Former International [2000/03]B23H9/00, B28B3/20
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/37]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum funkenerosiven Bearbeiten mittels eines Drahtes, und Strangpressmundstück[2003/25]
English:Wire electric discharge machining apparatus, wire electric discharge machining method, and mold for extrusion[2000/03]
French:Procéde et dispositif d'usinage par décharge électrique par fil, et matrice d'extrusion[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Funkenerosiven Bearbeiten mittels eines Drahtes, und Strangpressmundstück
Examination procedure15.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
18.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2003Fee for grant paid
15.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0743122  (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 25 * * abstract * [A] 4;
 [A]US4527035  (MAJESTIC PETER J [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 10 - line 21 * * abstract *
by applicantJPS56152531
 JPS62110816
 JPH01222821