Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977467

EP0977467 - Cooling device for halogen lamp in microwave ovens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]Cooling device for halogen lamp in microvave ovens
[2005/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [2006/04]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong,Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Hwi-chang, Sohn
141-1 19/1 Sarim-Dong
Changwon, Gyeongnam / KR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113865.215.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateKR1998001410529.07.1998         Original published format: KR 9814105
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977467
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977467
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977467
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/80
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kühlvorrichtung für Halogenlampen in Mikrowellenöfen[2005/32]
English:Cooling device for halogen lamp in microwave ovens[2005/32]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement pour lampes halogènes dans un four à micro-ondes[2005/32]
Former [2000/05]Kühlvorrichtung für Halogenlampen in der Mikrowellenöfen
Former [2000/05]Cooling device for halogen lamp in microvave ovens
Former [2000/05]Dispositif de refroidissement pour lampes halogènes dans les fours à micro-ondes
Examination procedure12.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
22.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2005Fee for grant paid
24.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9008449  (FRECH WOLFGANG [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 20 - line 32 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 14; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [Y]US4477706  (MITTELSTEADT ROBERT A [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 25 - line 31 * * column 5, line 8 - line 13 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 19; figures 1,9 *;
 [A]US3783219  (TATEDA K) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 18 - line 21 * * column 4, line 26 - line 35 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4550245  (ARAI TETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2, line 29 - line 57 * * column 3, line 46 - line 53 * * column 4, line 18 - line 59; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3878350  (TAKAGI YUTAKA) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - line 59; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US3936672  (TANAKA ATSUYUKI) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 34 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 10; figures 2,3 *