Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978492

EP0978492 - Method for reducing the hot-sticking during forming processes and apparatus used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/18]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
CERDEC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT KERAMISCHE FARBEN
Gutleutstrasse 215
D-60327 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ribes, Michel
13 rue des Erables
34830 Clapiers / FR
02 / Papet, Philippe
12 Clos de la Moutade
34730 Prades Le Lez / FR
03 / Thomas, Corinne
37 rue Maurice Ripoche
75014 Paris / FR
04 / Anquetil, Jerome
4 Place de la Collegiale
87400 Saint-Leonard / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Reinhardt, Markus
Reinhardt & Söllner
Patentanwälte
P.O. Box 1226
85542 Kirchheim bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/10]Reinhardt, Markus
Reinhardt Söllner Ganahl, Patentanwälte, P.O. Box 1226
85542 Kirchheim bei München / DE
Application number, filing date99113903.116.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateFR1998001000404.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810004
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978492
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C03B40/027, C03B23/03, C03B9/447
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verringerung des Heissverklebens bei Formgebungsprozessen sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[2000/06]
English:Method for reducing the hot-sticking during forming processes and apparatus used therefor[2000/06]
French:Procédé pour réduire le collage à chaud pendant des processus de formage et appareil pour excécuter ledit procédé[2000/06]
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
16.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
03.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS587367  ;
 [A]FR2641549  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3236620  (WILEY ROBERT F) [A] 12 * column W *;
 [A]EP0477785  (NIPPON SEISEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5578101  (BLONDER GREG E [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column W *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830405), vol. 7, no. 81, Database accession no. (M - 205), [X] 1-8,12,13 * abstract *