Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980646

EP0980646 - Rotobaler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Carteret, Frederic
Grand Rue
70100 Autrey les Gray / FR
02 / Georget, Claude
Rue des Peuvliers
70100 Chargey les Gray / FR
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99113906.416.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813726517.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837265
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980646
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980646
Date:02.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01F15/14
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rundballenpresse[2000/08]
English:Rotobaler[2000/08]
French:Presse à balles rondes[2000/08]
Examination procedure22.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
15.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2003Fee for grant paid
25.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0535532  (DEERE & CO [US]) [YD] 1 * column 7, line 41 - column 9, line 36; figures 4-6 *;
 [YA]GB2150491  (LELY NV C VAN DER) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,10;
 [AP]EP0858733  (DEERE & CO [US]) [AP] 1-3,7,10 * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0159953  (MARGARON ANDRE) [A] 1,7-10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4132664
 DE19705582