Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972919

EP0972919 - Internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SANSHIN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Masatetsu, c/oSanshin Kogyo K. K.
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Katayama, Goichi, c/oSanshin Kogyo K. K.
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113939.516.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020260817.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20260898
JP1998021208928.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21208998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972919
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972919
Date:27.02.2002
[2002/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972919
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02B61/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/46]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennkraftmaschine[2000/03]
English:Internal combustion engine[2000/03]
French:Moteur à combustion interne[2000/03]
Examination procedure10.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/24]
09.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2005Fee for grant paid
07.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5513606  (SHIBATA YASUHIKO) [X] 1-3,11,12,16 * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 7; figure - *;
 [X]JPH06122396  ;
 [PX]US5823835  (OISHI HIROSHI ET AL) [PX] 1-3,11 * column 2, line 66 - column 7, line 40; figure - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940803), vol. 018, no. 413, Database accession no. (M - 1649), & JP06122396 A 19940506 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *