Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985897

EP0985897 - Gun barrel provided with a support for a collimator which is mounted near the muzzle end [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall W & M GmbH
Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2
29345 Unterlüss / DE
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Baumann, Berthold
Virchowstrasse 6
29348 Eschede / DE
02 / Wagner, Hartmut
Berliner Strasse 32
29345 Unterlüss / DE
[2000/11]
Application number, filing date99113996.519.07.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateDE199814158511.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19841585
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985897
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0985897
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985897
Date:31.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41A21/00, F41G3/32, F41G1/54, F41G1/033, F41G1/02
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/11]F41A21/00, F41G3/32, F41G1/54, F41G1/033
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:Waffenrohr mit einer im Bereich der Rohrmündung angeordneten Kollimatorhalterung[2000/11]
English:Gun barrel provided with a support for a collimator which is mounted near the muzzle end[2000/11]
French:Tube de canon comportant un support pour collimateur disposé près de la bouche du canon[2000/11]
Examination procedure19.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
02.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2001Fee for grant paid
09.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI31.10.2001
IE31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
GR01.02.2002
AT19.07.2002
LU19.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
[2005/01]
Former [2004/43]FI31.10.2001
IE31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
AT19.07.2002
LU19.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/39]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
AT19.07.2002
LU19.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/10]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
AT19.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/03]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
AT19.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
Former [2003/51]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
BE31.07.2002
Former [2003/46]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
DK31.01.2002
PT31.01.2002
Former [2003/09]FI31.10.2001
NL31.10.2001
PT31.01.2002
Former [2002/48]FI31.10.2001
PT31.01.2002
Former [2002/33]FI31.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US5189245  (BUNDY MARK L [US]) [A] 1-7 * column A; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE275777  (MAUSER) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4779370  (CORMACK ALEXANDER J R [US]) [A] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 13 - line 24; figures 1,2,7-9 *;
 [A]US4959908  (WEYRAUCH ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 18; figure 6 *;
 [A]GB2283090  (SAGEM [FR])