Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976632

EP0976632 - Electronic air brake control system for railcars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
1000 Air Brake Avenue
Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Halvorson, David H.
316 Rock Ridge Road NW
Cedar Rapida, Iowa 52405 / US
02 / Sutherland, Dennis W.
899 Eastview Avenue
Marion, Iowa 52302 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date99113999.919.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998012740931.07.1998         Original published format: US 127409
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976632
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976632
Date:08.05.2002
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/66, B60T17/22, B60T7/22, B60T8/00, B61L23/34
[2002/19]
Former International [2000/05]B60T13/66, B60T17/22, B60T7/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/05]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Druckluftbremssteueranlage für Schienenfahrzeuge[2000/05]
English:Electronic air brake control system for railcars[2000/05]
French:Systéme de commande de freinage à air comprimé pour véhicules ferroviaires[2000/05]
Examination procedure07.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
11.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5758848  (BEULE ERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,14-16,18-20 * column 6, line 45 - column 10, line 9 * * column 12, line 14 - column 13, line 62; figures 1,2 * [Y] 11-13,21;
 [Y]US5757291  (KULL ROBERT C [US]) [Y] 11-13,21 * column 1, line 36 - column 1, line 52 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 64; figure 1 *;
 [PA]US5813635  (FERNANDEZ EMILIO A [US]) [PA] 1-21 * column 3, line 44 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [A]DE19547153  (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2211334  (PLESSEY CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [E]US5995737  (BONISSONE PIERO PATRONE [US], et al) [E] 1,14,20 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 7 *