Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0975048 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0975048



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 185
12.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.03.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
28.08.2007 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
07.08.2007 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
23.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.07.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.06.2007 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
20.06.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.06.2007 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
19.04.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.04.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
20.02.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.02.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.02.2007 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.02.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
07.02.2007 Means of redress Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
01.02.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.12.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.10.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.10.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
20.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
19.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
19.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.02.2006 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
27.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
27.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.01.2006 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
26.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
26.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
26.01.2006 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
29.11.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.10.2005 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
18.10.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
11.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.09.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.03.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
19.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
19.07.1999 Description Search / examination 9
19.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 8
19.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8