Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972971

EP0972971 - Control system for automatic vehicle transmission with estimation of driving resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/10]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kanasugi, Katsumi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Hiraki, Satoru
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Nagatani, Shuji
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
c/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114029.419.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998021985717.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21985798
JP1998021985817.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21985898
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972971
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972971
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972971
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/02, B60K28/16, // F16H59/14
[2000/28]
Former International [2000/03]F16H61/02, // F16H59/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/27]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung für Kraftfahrzeug-Automatikgetriebe, insbesondere mit Bestimmung des Fahrwiderstandes[2000/03]
English:Control system for automatic vehicle transmission with estimation of driving resistance[2000/03]
French:Système de commande d'une boîte à transmission automatique pour véhicules avec estimation de la résistance à l'avancement[2000/03]
Examination procedure19.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2005Fee for grant paid
29.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4625590  (MUELLER ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5598336  (KUME MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 8 - column 12; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5728026  (SAKAGUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US5231582  (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 *;
 [XA]US4648291  (KLATT ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 10,11 * column 8, line 15 - line 24; claim 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0698517  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 10 * claim 11 *
by applicantJPH04231218
 JPH06201523