Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974288

EP0974288 - Supporting device in particular for tooth cleaning devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ruhland, Gerhard
Lange Strasse 64
49080 Osnabrück / DE
For all designated states
Wagener, Wulf
Domhof 7c
49074 Osnabrück / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Busse & Busse
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Busse & Busse Patentanwälte
Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
Application number, filing date99114098.920.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813260721.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832607
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974288
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A46B17/08, A47K1/09
[2000/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Halterung von insbesondere Zahnreinigungsgeräten[2000/04]
English:Supporting device in particular for tooth cleaning devices[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de support en particulier de dispositifs pour nettoyer les dents[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
13.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XPY]WO9855007  (INNOSCENT LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 11 * * figures 2,4,6 * [Y] 9;
 [X]US4515332  (SCHARFY MADELON L [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]CH208474  (BATT HUGO DR [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document * * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE734522  (PAUL GUIDO NIERTH) [X] 1 * the whole document * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US3782799  (HANSEN H) [X] 1,5,10 * the whole document * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]WO9427479  (SMITH COLIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 16, line 33 - page 17, line 2 * * figures 6,9 *;
 [X]US5573019  (HEMPEL JEFFREY D [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 31 - line 42 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US1899242  (ALEXANDER MCNAB) [X] 1,8,10 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 63 - line 76 * * column 2, line 91 - column 3, line 7 *;
 [Y]US2611477  (KEYS WILLIAM J) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 23 - line 29 * * figure 2 *
by applicantDE19634920