Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976725

EP0976725 - Process for the continuous preparation of amino-halogenophenyl alkyl thioethers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Chemicals AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2004/02]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kiel, Wolfgang, Dr.
Carl-Leverkus-Strasse 37
51519 Odenthal / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99114114.416.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813410229.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834102
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976725
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976725
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976725
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C319/20
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung von Amino-halogenphenyl-alkylthioethern[2000/05]
English:Process for the continuous preparation of amino-halogenophenyl alkyl thioethers[2000/05]
French:Procédé pour la préparation continue d'amino- halogéno-phényl alkyl thioéthers[2000/05]
Examination procedure19.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/34]
12.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2003Fee for grant paid
10.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
AT16.07.2004
LU16.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
AT16.07.2004
LU16.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/13]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
AT16.07.2004
LU16.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
LU16.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0315862  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * page 3, column 1, lines 19-41; claim 5 * * page 3, column 1, lines 32-41; claim 5 * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]EP0331144  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 4; claim 19 * * page 4; claim 19 * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]EP0775693  (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9611906  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 9; examples H-4 *;
 [XY]  INOUE H ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF HALOGEN-SUBSTITUTED 1,5-BENZOTHIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR VASODILATING AND HYPOTENSIVE ACTIVITIES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (19910201), vol. 34, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 675 - 687, XP000616258 [X] 1,4,5,8 * page 683, column 1 * * page 683, column 1 * [Y] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00106a032
 [X]  KATSUMI ITOH ET AL., "Synthesis and angiotensin converting enzyme inhibitory activity of 1,5-benzothiazepine and 1,5-benzoxazepine derivatives.", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO., JP, (1986), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1128 - 1147, XP001030863 [X] 1,4,5,8 * page 1139 - page 1141, line 3; tables IV,V *
 [A]  CORRAL C ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF 10-(4-METHYL-1-PIPERAZINYL)THIENOU3,2-BU1,5BENZOTHIAZEPINES", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, HETEROCORPORATION. PROVO, US, (19850901), vol. 22, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1345 - 1348, XP000616259 [A] 1,4,5 * page 1347 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570220541