EP0974636 - Ferrielectric liquid crystal compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mine, Takakiyo, c/o Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
Johno, Masahiro, c/o Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP | 03 /
Yui, Tomoyuki, c/o Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114143.3 | 20.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | JP19980209363 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20936398 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974636 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974636 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/20, C07C69/94 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07C69/94 (EP,US);
C09K19/12 (KR);
C09K19/2021 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/41] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ferrielektrische Flüssigkristallverbindung | [2000/04] | English: | Ferrielectric liquid crystal compound | [2000/04] | French: | Composé liquide cristallin ferriélectrique | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0425366 (SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU [JP]) [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0342046 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,4-7 *; | [A]EP0853076 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-4,11 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0893429 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-11 * the whole document * |