Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974299

EP0974299 - Clamshell cooking apparatus having an electronic gap adjustment mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
Carrier World Headquarters Building, One Carrier Place
Farmington, Connecticut 06034-4015 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
Carrier World Headquarters Building, One Carrier Place
Farmington, Connecticut 06034-4015 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SPECIALTY EQUIPMENT COMPANIES, INC.
1245 Corporate Boulevard, Suite 401
Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Newton, Robert K.
746 Garfield Avenue
Beloit, Wisconsin 53511 / US
02 / Erickson, Mark T.
841 Jerico Lane
Sun Prairie, Wisconsin 53590 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99114167.221.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012078722.07.1998         Original published format: US 120787
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974299
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974299
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974299
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47J37/06
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/50]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät mit zwei einander gegenüber liegenden Kochplatten mit einer elektronischen Regelung ihrer Entfernung[2000/04]
English:Clamshell cooking apparatus having an electronic gap adjustment mechanism[2000/04]
French:Appareil avec deux plaques de cuisson l'une en face de l'autre avec un réglage électronique de leur distance[2000/04]
Examination procedure14.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
27.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2002Fee for grant paid
30.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Request for further processing for:27.06.2001Request for further processing filed
27.06.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DPX]US5791234  (NEWTON ROBERT K [US], et al) [DPX] 1-20 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 5; figure 2 *;
 [XA]US4627335  (SHERMAN VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 43; figures 3,4,9 * [A] 16,17;
 [XA]EP0759279  (TECHNYFORM PRODUCTION [FR]) [X] 7 * column 6, line 46 - column 8, line 59; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,16;
 [A]US4586428  (ADAMSON LEE E [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7,12,16,18 * column 3, line 53 - column 7, line 33; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]US5423253  (OLSON LARRY R [US], et al) [A] 1,7,16 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,3-5 *;
 [A]FR2406934  (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH [DE])