Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974702

EP0974702 - Automotive soil treating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.
6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Hisayoshi
1-18-5,Chuo, Ushiku-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Sato, Fujio
2349, Tamadori, Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Yasuharu
5-84, Sumizaki, Nishio-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Murai, Toshikazu
3233-6, Shimo-inayoshi,Chiyoda-machi, Niihari-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
05 / Miura, Tetsushiro
2539-5 Okazu-cho, Izumi-ku,Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
06 / Nakagiri, Fumiki
5-5,Renshoji,Odawara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
07 / Kusaki, Takami
2605-118, Shimo-inayoshi,Chiyoda-machi,Niihari-dun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
08 / Sekino, Satoshi
1-21-7, Matsuba,Ryugasaki-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
09 / Hirose, Kiyonobu
1-119-17,Kariya-machi,Ushiku-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
10 / Mizumo, Yoshio
1204-46,Nakano, Osashima-cho, Ena-shi
Gifu-ken / JP
11 / Ito, Nobuo
200-4,Aza Nakaemukai,Oaza Hachisuka,Miwa-cho
Ama-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
12 / Fukuzawa, Hideki
2476-11,Aza Kanenawate,Nakashidami,Moriyama-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114174.822.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020964724.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20964798
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974702
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974702
Date:12.06.2002
[2002/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:E02F5/22, E02F7/02, E02F7/06
[2002/24]
Former International [2000/04]E02F5/22
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2003/10]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SELBSTFAHRENDE BODENBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE[2000/04]
English:Automotive soil treating machine[2000/04]
French:Machine automotrice de traitement du sol[2000/04]
Examination procedure07.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
16.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/38]
02.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200709   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[PXL]WO9853148  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al) [PXL] 1-3,10-13,16 * the whole document *;
 EP0915205  [ ] (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]);
 [XY]JPS6265727  ;
 [YA]JPH09195265  ;
 [A]FR2326542  (UNIT RIG & EQUIP [US]) [A] 9 * page 8, line 3 - line 27 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4272212  (BAUER JR ANDREW J, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870825), vol. 011, no. 262, Database accession no. (C - 442), [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * [Y] 7,8,10,16
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, [Y] 7,8,10,16 * abstract * [A] 1
by applicantJPH09195265
 WO9853148