Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979706

EP0979706 - Machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky
Plochinger Strasse 92
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky
Plochinger Strasse 92
73730 Esslingen / DE
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
INDEX-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG HAHN & TESSKY
Plochinger Strasse 92
73730 Esslingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Link, Helmut, Friedrich
Obere Burgstrasse 43
73773 Aichwald 1 (Schanbach) / DE
02 / Trautmann, Günther, Heinrich
Egelsbergstrasse 7
73230 Kirchheim-Nabern / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99114201.923.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813595408.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835954
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979706
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979706
Date:06.06.2001
[2001/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979706
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23Q1/00, B23Q39/04
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [2002/09]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Werkzeugmaschine[2000/07]
English:Machine tool[2000/07]
French:Machine-outil[2000/07]
Examination procedure03.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
07.12.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.04.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
22.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2004Fee for grant paid
28.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.02.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.03.2004
ES12.07.2004
[2006/14]
Former [2005/02]ES12.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0811464  (INDEX WERKE KG HAHN & TESSKY [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4185366  (GILBERT HAROLD J [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 39-46 *
by applicantDE19622475