Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975191

EP0975191 - Service specific interfacing in point to multipoint communications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hughes Electronics Corporation
200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo
California 90245-0956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Hughes Electronics Corporation
200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard
El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lohman Mike.S
15719 Mahog Circle 201
Gaithersburg Maryland 20878 / US
02 / Yeung On Wa
7366 Mesa College Drive 3
San Diego, California 92111 / US
03 / Yue Jingxing
11939 Briar Leave Way
San Diego California 92128 / US
04 / Wendling Daniel.R
19201Barnestown Road
Bickerson, Maryland 20842 / US
05 / Keyur Parikh
11655 Drumcastle Terrace
Germantown, Maryland 20876 / US
06 / Khan Tayyab
10120 Little pondPlace 4
Montgomery Village, Maryland20886 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Lindner, Michael , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Lindner, Michael , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/04]Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 105462
70046 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99114206.826.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS19980094106P24.07.1998         Original published format: US 94106 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975191
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975191
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/28
[2004/10]
Former International [2000/04]H04Q11/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Dienstanpassungen in Punkt- zu Mehrpunktkommunikationen[2000/04]
English:Service specific interfacing in point to multipoint communications[2000/04]
French:Dispositif d'interface specifique pour des services dans une communication de point à multipoint[2000/04]
Examination procedure03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
16.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2320642  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-76 * figures 2,3,5 * * page 1, lines 28-41 * * page 2, lines 17-37 * * page 3 - lines 1-12 * * page 5, lines 14-25 * * page 6, lines 7-29 * * page 11, lines 13-21 * * page 13, lines 14-27 * * page 20, lines 18-28 * * page 22, lines 18-28 *;
 [Y]EP0836356  (MELITA INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-76 * figures 1,2,5 * * column 1, lines 50-58 * * column 2, lines 1-19,41-58 * * column 3, lines 1-19 * * column 4, lines 44-58 * * column 5, lines 1-4 * * column 9, lines 3-14 * * column 12, lines 30-58 * * column 13, lines 1-7 * * column 17, lines 1-38 * * column 20, lines 27-41 *;
 [A]WO9703526  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-76 * page 1, lines 4-37 * * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 3, lines 15-21 * * page 5, lines 16-37 * * page 11, lines 19-33 * * page 12, lines 23-37 * * page 13, lines 35-37 * * page 15, lines 1-7 *