Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977323

EP0977323 - Assembly containing a modular jack and a light emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI's Hertogenbosch BV
Helftheuvelweg 11
5222 AV's - Hertogenbosch / NL
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Belopolsky, Yakov
2407 West Bayberry Drive
Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17112 / US
02 / Potteiger, Lee W.
733 Capri Circle
Lewisberry, Pennsylvania 17339 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114244.928.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998012714831.07.1998         Original published format: US 127148
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977323
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977323
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/629, H01R13/717, H01R24/00
[2001/09]
Former International [2000/05]H01R13/629, H01R13/717
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Modulare RJ-Verbindung mit lichtemittierender Diode[2000/05]
English:Assembly containing a modular jack and a light emitting diode[2000/05]
French:Dispositif à jack modulaire ayant une diode electroluminescente[2000/05]
Examination procedure28.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/33]
09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0862245  (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [PX] 1,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9809347  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9833242  (VALOR ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5759067  (SCHEER PETER L [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9806152  (BERG TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5647767  (SCHEER PETER L [US], et al) [A] 1,17,19 * the whole document *