Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976625

EP0976625 - Passenger detecting system and air bag apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda elesys Co., Ltd.
18-7, Hiraide Kogyodanchi Utsunomiya-shi
Tochigi 321-0905 / JP
[2003/16]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oka, Yoshitaka
c/o NEC Home Electronics Ltd. 4-24 Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Baba, Satoshi
c/o NEC Home Electronics Ltd. 4-24 Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2005/16]
Former [2000/05]01 / Oka, Yoshitaka
NEC Home Electronics Ltd., 4-24 Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Baba, Satoshi
NEC Home Electronics Ltd., 4-24 Shiromi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114256.328.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021294928.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21294998
JP1998024589431.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24589498
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976625
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976625
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976625
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/32, B60R21/01, G01V3/08
[2000/51]
Former International [2000/05]B60R21/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Sitzbelegungserkennung und Airbagssystem unter Verwendung derselben[2000/05]
English:Passenger detecting system and air bag apparatus using the same[2000/05]
French:Système de détection de passager et système airbag l 'utilisant[2000/05]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Fee for grant paid
18.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9731238  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,3,6,10,11,16 * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 14 * * figures 1A,3A *;
 [ELA]JPH11271463  ;
 [A]EP0838697  (IEE SARL [LU]) [A] 1,2,11 * column 4, line 22 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 1,5,6 *
 [ELA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, [EL] 1,2,4-6,10,11,14,16 * abstract * [A] 7-9,12,13,15
by applicantJPH0446843
 JPH0352266U
 JPS61113527
 JPH09509118
 JPH10197669
 JPH10197670
 JPH10197671
 JPH10245893