Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980147

EP0980147 - Optical sample and hold architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Los Angeles
CA 90067-2199 / US
[2006/23]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ferguson, Bruce A.
2306A Vail Avenue Redondo Beach
CA 90278 / US
02 / Fields, Richard A.
2006 Robinson Street
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
03 / Kintis, Mark
1636 Voorhees Avenue
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
04 / Kunkee, Elizabeth T.
2801 Alma Avenue
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US
05 / Lembo, Lawrence J.
5530 West 190th Street No. 141
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
06 / Perkins, Stephen R.
1723 Wollacott Street
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
07 / Rollins, David L.
15000 Gerkin Avenue
Hawthorne, CA 90250 / US
08 / Upton, Eric L.
2516 Curtis Avenue No. 1
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114281.129.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013303611.08.1998         Original published format: US 133036
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980147
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980147
Date:19.11.2003
[2003/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980147
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/36, G02F7/00, H01S5/50, H01S3/106, G02F1/015, G02B6/28, G02B6/34
[2003/47]
Former International [2000/07]H03M1/36, G02F7/00, H01S5/50, H01S3/106, G02F1/015
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2004/33]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Architektur einer optischen Abtast- und Halteschaltung[2000/07]
English:Optical sample and hold architecture[2000/07]
French:Architecture d'un échantillonneur-bloqueur optique[2000/07]
Examination procedure14.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
20.05.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2006Fee for grant paid
11.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06011375.0  / EP1696262
EP06011376.8  / EP1701446
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.06.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
[2007/30]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9520847  (BARNSLEY PETER EDWARD ;MCGUIRE ALAN (GB); BRITISH TELECOMM (GB); H) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * page 12, line 9 - page 21, line 28; figures 2B,3,5B-8 * [Y] 4,8,9,11-13;
 [XAY]US5475525  (TOURNOIS PIERRE ET AL) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 65; claim 1 * [A] 2-4,6-8,10-13 [Y] 9;
 [XY]US5140651  (SOREF RICHARD A ET AL) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8;
 [XY]US5214729  (KOAI KWANG-TSAI) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 67 * [Y] 11-13;
 [A]US4738527  (MCBRIEN GREGORY J) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *