Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977198

EP0977198 - Recording media playback apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU TEN, LTD.
2-28, Goshodori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 652 / JP
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Fujimoto, Fumihiko
27-8-202 Ikegami 4-chome
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114297.730.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021615630.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21615698
JP1998021615830.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21615898
JP1998021615930.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21615998
JP1998021616030.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21616098
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977198
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977198
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977198
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/22
[2000/49]
Former International [2000/05]G11B17/22, G11B17/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/34]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungs/wiedergabegerät für ein Aufzeichnungsmedium[2000/05]
English:Recording media playback apparatus[2000/05]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement et reproduction de support d'enregistrement[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
07.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
12.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2004Fee for grant paid
15.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19725169  (FUJITSU TEN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11,16-20,31-38 * column 12, line 6 - column 20, line 14 * [A] 2-10,12-15,21-30;
 [XA]EP0833324  (NAKAMICHI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,11,16-30 * column 9, line 4 - line 39; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-10,12;
 [E]EP0944070  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1-3,9-11,16-20 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053]; figures 14-20 *;
 [X]JPH1021628  ;
 US5986981  [ ] (TAKEMASA KAORU [JP], et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [X] 1,11,16 * abstract *