Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974717

EP0974717 - Locking means comprising a first component and a second component which is removably coupled to the first component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DI. BI. Porte Blindate S.r.l.
Via Einaudi, 2
61032 Fano / IT
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Delvecchio, Michele
Via Rosmini 3
61032 Fano / IT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Crugnola, Pietro , et al
Luppi Intellectual Property Srl
Viale Corassori, 54
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/07]Crugnola, Pietro , et al
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41100 Modena / IT
Former [2000/04]Luppi, Luigi
Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date99114341.321.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateIT1998MO0016621.07.1998         Original published format: IT MO980166
[2000/04]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974717
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974717
Date:19.11.2003
[2003/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974717
Date:23.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:E05B9/00, E05B9/06, E05C9/00, E05B9/08, E05B63/00
[2003/45]
Former International [2003/03]E05B9/00, E05B9/06, E05C9/00, E05B9/08
Former International [2000/04]E05B9/00, E05B9/06, E05C9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Schliessvorrichtung mit einem ersten Teil und einem am ersten Teil lösbar verbundenen zweiten Teil[2000/04]
English:Locking means comprising a first component and a second component which is removably coupled to the first component[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de fermeture avec un premier élément et avec un deuxième élément, fixé de façon amovible au premier élément[2000/04]
Examination procedure17.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
11.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2007
31.10.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.03.2008Fee for grant paid
07.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
LU21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
[2019/34]
Former [2011/32]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
LU21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2011/25]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
IT21.07.2008
LU21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2010/44]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
CY23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
IT21.07.2008
LU21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2010/28]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
IT21.07.2008
LU21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2010/06]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
IE21.07.2008
IT21.07.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/30]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
GB23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/18]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/12]AT23.04.2008
BE23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
DE24.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/08]AT23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES03.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0632177  (FICHET BAUCHE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * figures 3-8 * * column 2, line 40 - line 47 *;
 [X]US3930390  (KELLER ERNST) [X] 1,5,7 * figures 1A-1D *;
 [X]DE9406586U  (EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE2530080  (NIEDERDRENK JUL FA [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * the whole document *
by applicantIT1295464
 IT210493U