Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004440

EP1004440 - Multiple-zone inkjet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.11.2006  [2006/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto
CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street, M/S 20BN
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Shih-Yuan
766 Encina Grande
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Eva , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Liesegang, Eva , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Josef-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114361.121.07.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateUS1998019998624.11.1998         Original published format: US 199986
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004440
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004440
Date:16.08.2000
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004440
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/04, B41J2/51, B41J13/32
[2000/34]
Former International [2000/22]B41J2/04, B41J2/51
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/18]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Tintenstrahldrucken mit mehreren Zonen[2000/22]
English:Multiple-zone inkjet printer[2000/22]
French:Imprimante à jet d'encre à zones multiples[2000/22]
Examination procedure21.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2005Fee for grant paid
04.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XPA]EP0924092  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [XP] 6 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 52 * * column 3, line 20 - column 7, line 45; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,7-10;
 [A]US5216442  (PARKS BRUCE J [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 58 - column 10, line 54; figures 1-6C *;
 [A]EP0653367  (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 20 - column 8, line 7 *;
 [A]US5540370  (RING ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 67 * * column 4, line 63 - column 10, line 63; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]EP0616895  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5145168  (JONAS ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS5742305