Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974265

EP0974265 - Assembly for appropriately locating swallow nests on building walls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sembritzky, Ute
Stralsunder Strasse 15
17489 Greifswald / DE
[2001/35]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Sembitzky, Ute
Stralsunder Strasse 15
17489 Greifswald / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sembritzky, Jörg
/ 17489 Greifswald / DE
02 / Sembritzky, Ute, Geb. Panknin
/ 17489 Greifswald / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Meyerhöfer, Dietmar
Patentanwalt
Rudolf-Petershagen-Allee 12
17489 Greifswald / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Meyerhöfer, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Rudolf-Petershagen-Allee 12
17489 Greifswald / DE
Application number, filing date99114378.522.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813319823.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833198
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974265
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974265
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01K31/14, A01M29/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Anordnung zur artengerechten Plazierung von Schwalbennestern an Gebäudewänden[2000/04]
English:Assembly for appropriately locating swallow nests on building walls[2000/04]
French:Ensemble pour la localisation appropriée des nids d'hirondelle sur les murs d'un bâtiment[2000/04]
Examination procedure03.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
15.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.09.2000Fee for grant paid
19.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.04.2001
FI11.04.2001
FR11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
IT11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
GR13.07.2001
LU22.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
ES30.10.2001
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]CY11.04.2001
FI11.04.2001
FR11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
GR13.07.2001
LU22.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2005/01]CY11.04.2001
FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
GR13.07.2001
LU22.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2004/39]CY11.04.2001
FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
LU22.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2004/05]CY11.04.2001
FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2003/06]FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
Former [2002/48]FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
IE11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
Former [2002/27]FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
PT11.07.2001
SE11.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
Former [2002/17]FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
SE11.07.2001
FR07.09.2001
Former [2002/15]FI11.04.2001
GB11.04.2001
SE11.07.2001
Former [2002/05]SE11.07.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US5092088  (WAY MICHAEL F W [AU]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *
 [A]  Prospect "Vogelschutz - Naturschutz", SCHORNDORF (DE), FIRMA SCHWEGLER, VOGEL- & NATURSCHUTZPRODUKTE GMBH, XP002116774 [A] 1 * page 23 *