Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974559

EP0974559 - Low melting point composite glass solder, its filler component, as well as its uses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For:AT  DE  FR  NL 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
[2002/16]
Former [2000/04]For:AT  DE  FR  NL 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Siebers, Friedrich, Dr.
Winzerstrasse 7
55283 Nierstein / DE
02 / Mund, Dietrich
Buchenstrasse 9
84101 Obersüssbach / DE
03 / Paschke, Hartmut, Dr.
Bargrabenstrasse 11
84030 Ergolding / DE
04 / Beudt, Hans-Werner
Brentanostrasse 30
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Naupliastrasse 110
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche, Patentanwälte
Naupliastrasse 110
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114424.722.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813325223.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833252
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974559
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974559
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974559
Date:05.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C8/24, C03C14/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/14]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Komposit-Lotglas mit niedriger Aufschmelztemperatur, ein Füllstoff hierfür, sowie deren Verwendung[2000/04]
English:Low melting point composite glass solder, its filler component, as well as its uses[2000/04]
French:Verre de soudure composite à bas point de fusion, sa matière de charge et son utilisation[2000/04]
Examination procedure22.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
28.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2002Fee for grant paid
20.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS5357499  ;
 [X]JPS5357498  ;
 [X]JPS5357497
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780728), vol. 002, no. 092, Database accession no. (E - 046), [X] 1-4 * abstract *