Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975084

EP0975084 - Method and apparatus for switching circuit system including a saturable core device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION
1745 Overland Avenue, N.E. Post Office Box 991
Warren, OH 44482 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Baskette, Robert W.
179 South Franklin Street
Chagrin Falls, Ohio 44022 / US
02 / Bass, Gregory A.
S. Meridian Road
Austintown, Ohio 44511 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114427.022.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012187924.07.1998         Original published format: US 121879
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975084
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975084
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975084
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/538
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2002/01]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für einen Schaltkreis mit einem sättigbaren Kernvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:Method and apparatus for switching circuit system including a saturable core device[2000/04]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour un circuit de commutation avec un dispositif à noyau saturable[2000/04]
Examination procedure12.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
19.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2003Fee for grant paid
26.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE03.09.2003
FR03.09.2003
DE04.12.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/44]BE03.09.2003
DE04.12.2003
Former [2004/28]BE03.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5063488  (HARADA KOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 12 - line 19; figure 13 * * column 11, line 11 - line 39 *;
 [A]JPH05236738  ;
 [A]JPH08228478  ;
 [A]DE3241086  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 17-19 *;
 [A]DE4321988  (ELIN ENERGIEANWENDUNG [AT]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 017, no. 698, Database accession no. (E - 1481), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, [A] 1,6 * abstract *