Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978727

EP0978727 - Magnetic field generator for MRI and method for assembling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]Magnetic field generator for MRI, method for assembling the same and method for assembling a magnet unit for the same
[2005/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neomax Co., Ltd.
7-19 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
Neomax Co., Ltd.
7-19 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
Neomax Co., Ltd.
4-7-19 Kitahama, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SUMITOMO SPECIAL METALS COMPANY LIMITED
7-19, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aoki, Masaaki
10-5-501, Kamihamuro 1-chome
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Hashimoto, Shigeo
9-2, Kaisei 6-chome
Saga-shi, Saga-ken / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114441.122.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998022344406.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22344498
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978727
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978727
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978727
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/383
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetfelderzeuger für die Magnetresonanzbildgebung und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau desselben[2005/25]
English:Magnetic field generator for MRI and method for assembling the same[2005/25]
French:Générateur de champ magnétique pour l'IRM et procédé pour assembler le même[2005/25]
Former [2000/06]Magnetfelderzeuger für die Magnetresonanzbildgebung, Verfahren zum Zusammenbau desselben und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau einer Magneteinheit für denselben
Former [2000/06]Magnetic field generator for MRI, method for assembling the same and method for assembling a magnet unit for the same
Former [2000/06]Générateur de champ magnétique pour l'IRM, procédé pour assembler le même et procédé pour assembler une unité d'aimant pour le même
Examination procedure31.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
03.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.02.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, FR, NL
13.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2005Fee for grant paid
13.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05008190.0  / EP1557684
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.12.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.12.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB22.07.2006
[2007/30]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0394733  ;
 [A]JPS6449549  ;
 [A]EP0591542  (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 15; figure 3 *;
 [AD]JPH06224029  ;
 [A]JPS62256416  ;
 [A]JPH04371136
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910712), vol. 015, no. 275, Database accession no. (C - 0849), [X] 1-3,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890605), vol. 013, no. 238, Database accession no. (C - 603), [A] 1,10,12 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941110), vol. 018, no. 590, Database accession no. (E - 1628), [AD] 1,10,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880421), vol. 012, no. 130, Database accession no. (E - 603), [A] 14-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930517), vol. 017, no. 243, Database accession no. (C - 1058), [A] 14-18 * abstract *