Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980931

EP0980931 - A method of installing a railway track [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfleiderer Infrastrukturtechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Ingolstädter Strasse 51
92318 Neumarkt / DE
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Bachmann, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Langobardenstrasse 12
92318 Neumarkt / DE
02 / Mohr, Winfried, Dipl.-Ing.
Altenhofweg 46
92318 Neumarkt / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99114454.423.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813736018.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837360
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980931
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980931
Date:30.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/44]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0980931
Date:27.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E01B2/00, E01B1/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Einbauverfahren für eine feste Schienenfahrbahn[2000/08]
English:A method of installing a railway track[2000/08]
French:Procédé d'installation d'une voie ferrée[2000/08]
Examination procedure11.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
26.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2002Fee for grant paid
02.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2002   
Walter-Heilit Verkehrswegebau GmbH
Klausenburger Strasse 9
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruttensperger, Bernhard
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patentanwälte
Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2002   
Walter-Heilit Verkehrswegebau GmbH
Klausenburger Strasse 9
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruttensperger, Bernhard, Dipl.-Phys.
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
05.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.12.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
25.10.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.11.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.03.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.05.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Former [2007/34]IT23.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US5653388  (PIETSCHMANN DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7 * column W *;
 [A]EP0715021  (HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]) [A] 1-3,7 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 30; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3539225  (MAX KNAPE GMBH & CO FA [DE]) [A] 1,5;
 [PXA]DE19741059  (WAYSS & FREYTAG AG [DE]) [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * [PA] 4,5,7;
 [PXA]DE19708896  (WAYSS & FREYTAG AG [DE]) [PX] 1-3 * column W * [PA] 4,5,7
ExaminationDE19653858
    DYWIDAG VERKEHRSBAUTEN, Sonderdruck der Dyckerhoff & Widmann AG, Feste Fahrbahn-Konstruktionen, Sonderdruck aus der "Oberbau" - Publikation zur Fachtagung 3/88,