Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974558

EP0974558 - Electrically conductive paste and glass substrate having a circuit thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sanada, Tomoki
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Gossel, Hans K. , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114529.323.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998022534624.07.1998         Original published format: JP 22534698
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974558
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974558
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974558
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C8/18, C03C17/00, C03C8/02
[2000/29]
Former International [2000/04]C03C8/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/14]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisch leitende Paste und Glassubstrat mit aufgetragenem elektrischen Schaltkreis[2000/04]
English:Electrically conductive paste and glass substrate having a circuit thereon[2000/04]
French:Pâte électriquement conductrice et substrat en verre ayant un circuit électrique déposé sur celui-ci[2000/04]
Examination procedure23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
24.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2002Fee for grant paid
29.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT15.01.2003
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1012043  ;
 [PX]US5795501  (KANO HARUHIKO [JP]) [PX] 4,7,8,10,11 * column 2, line 32 - line 40 * * column 2, line 60 - line 66 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 38 * * column 6, line 27 - line 42 *;
 [X]JPH0992028  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 4,7,8,10,11;
 [PX]US5876841  (BANBA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [PX] 4,8 * column A * * column 5, line 17 - line 20 * * column 5, line 28 - line 30 *;
 [X]JPH09180541  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 4,8;
 [E]US5972485  (SANADA TOMOKI [JP]) [E] 4,7,8,10,11 * column 2, line 8 - line 13 * * table 1 *;
 [PX]JPH11130459  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [PX] 4,7,8,10,11
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [X] 1-3,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - YAWALE S P ET AL, "D.C. CONDUCTIVITY AND HOPPING MACHANISM IN BI2O3-B2O3 GLASSES", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE,GB,CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, (19931015), vol. 28, no. 20, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 5451 - 5455, XP000399089 [X] 1-3 * page 5451, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 5453, column L, paragraphs 3,4 * * example YX7; table 1 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00367814