Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074320

EP1074320 - Punch- and embossing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERNST GROB AG, Kaltwalzmaschinen
Rohrgasse 9
8708 Männedorf / CH
[2001/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Dériaz, Daniel
Im Luft
8706 Meilen / CH
02 / Dériaz, Marc
Raingässli 48
8706 Meilen / CH
03 / Geser, Peter
Schwerzestrasse 29
8618 Oetwil am See / CH
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)TSWpat Luzern AG
Habsburgerstrasse 20
6002 Luzern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Kemény AG Patentanwaltbüro
Habsburgerstrasse 20
6002 Luzern / CH
Application number, filing date99114647.327.07.1999
[2001/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1074320
Date:07.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074320
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B21D28/28
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:Stanz- und Prägemaschine[2002/50]
English:Punch- and embossing machine[2001/06]
French:Machine de poinçonnage et d'estampage[2001/06]
Former [2001/06]Stanz-und Prägemaschine
Examination procedure26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2003Fee for grant paid
24.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY27.07.2003
LU27.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2005/02]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY27.07.2003
LU27.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
Former [2004/39]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY27.07.2003
LU27.07.2003
Former [2004/36]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY27.07.2003
Former [2004/23]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0448508  (EICH DIETER [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2075403  (BURNER SYSTEMS INT);
 [A]US2630862  (WALTON MUSSER C, et al)