Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989197

EP0989197 - Method for surface treating the inner surface of hollow bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Izquierdo, Patrick
Sedan Strasse 27
89077 Ulm / DE
02 / Kaiserauer, Karl-Heinz
Steinenberg 22
89584 Ehningen-Erbstetten / DE
03 / Lahres, Michael, Dr.
Bessererstrasse 33
89073 Ulm / DE
04 / Storz, Oliver
Ingeborg-Bachmann-Strasse 29
89134 Blaustein / DE
[2000/13]
Application number, filing date99114750.528.07.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateDE199814011703.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19840117
[2000/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989197
Date:29.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989197
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C4/02
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/50]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Oberflächenbearbeitung der Innenseite von Hohlkörpern[2000/13]
English:Method for surface treating the inner surface of hollow bodies[2000/13]
French:Méthode d'usinage de la surface interne de corps creux[2000/13]
Examination procedure19.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
29.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2002Fee for grant paid
04.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/05]SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US5622753  (SHEPLEY BARRY E [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 41 *;
 [XD]EP0716158  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [XD] 1-9 * column 4, lines 15-32; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5691004  (PALAZZOLO CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 54; figure 1 *