Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972779

EP0972779 - Oligonucleotide-polyamide conjugates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2007  [2007/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOWARD FLOREY INSTITUTE OF EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY AND MEDICINE
University of Melbourne
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
HOWARD FLOREY INSTITUTE OF EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY AND MEDICINE
c/o University of Melbourne
Parkville VIC 3052 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Haralambidis, Jim
156 Elgar Road
Box Hill South, VIC 3128 / AU
02 / Tregear, Geoffrey William
62 Hawthorn Grove
Hawthorn, VIC 3122 / AU
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99114825.525.10.1988
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateAU1987PI0511128.10.1987         Original published format: AU PI511187
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972779
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972779
Date:20.10.2004
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/00, C07K7/02, C08G69/48, A61K47/48, C12Q1/68
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Oligonucleotid-Polyamid Konjugate[2000/03]
English:Oligonucleotide-polyamide conjugates[2000/03]
French:Conjugués d'oligonucléotide-polyamide[2000/03]
Examination procedure17.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
31.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/47]
04.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/47]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP88909271.4  / EP0383803
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 13
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 14
19.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 15
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 16
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 17
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 18
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0154884  (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * example 2 *;
 [A]US4701499  (KORNREICH WAYNE D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1 *;
 [A]US4569967  (KORNREICH WAYNE D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1 *;
 [PX]  - HARALAMBIDIS J ET AL, "THE SOLID PHASE SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES CONTAINING A 3'-PEPTIDE MOIETY", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19871028), vol. 28, no. 43, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5199 - 5202, XP002277049 [PX] 1-3 * page 5201, scheme II; page 5202, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95628-4
 [PX]  - HARALAMBIDIS J ET AL, "A new generation of non-radioactive DNA probes: oligonucleotides containing a multifunctional 3'-polyamide moiety", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, SAPPORO JAPAN, (19880919), vol. 20, pages 115 - 116, XP002277050 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document *