Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976694

EP0976694 - Insulating leightweight plaster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hahn, Klaus, Dr.
Im Bügen 9
67281 Kirchheim / DE
02 / Steinbrecher, Horst
Im Blümel 14
67354 Römerberg / DE
03 / Lindhof, Werner
Brahmsstrasse 7
67227 Frankenthal / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99114833.929.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813456031.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834560
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976694
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976694
Date:24.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C04B16/08
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Wärmedämmender Leichtputz[2000/05]
English:Insulating leightweight plaster[2000/05]
French:Enduit léger et isolant[2000/05]
Examination procedure07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
03.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2004Fee for grant paid
13.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT24.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY24.03.2004
FI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/14]FI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/13]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/51]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/25]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
LU29.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/03]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/01]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI24.03.2004
SE24.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9210438  (NAT POWER PLC [GB]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 21 - line 33 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 17 *;
 [A]GB1263340  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 1 *;
 [A]DE29623459U  (MM STYRO RECYCLING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 19; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0470455  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4011355  (MANDISH THEODORE O, et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1 *;
 [A]US4040855  (RADY-PENTEK ARTHUR A, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3345550  (WOLF HEINZ) [A] 1-3 * page 3 - page 4 *