Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976591

EP0976591 - Vehicle wheel suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68, Kami-shioda, Aza, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 458 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
CHUO HATSUJO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
68, Kami-shioda, Aza, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 458 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imaizumi, Toshiyuki No. 708, PARUNESU
1735, Zene, Zengo-cho
Toyoake city, Aichi pref. / JP
02 / Aoyama, Toshiho
3-108, Shimomigaoka, Midori-ku
Nagoya city, Aichi pref. / JP
03 / Kamiya, Shuji
131, Sumiyoshi, Higashizakai-cho
Kariya city, Aichi pref. / JP
04 / Irie, Koichi
17-8, Futamuradai 2-chome
Toyoake city, Aichi pref. / JP
05 / Gotoh, Takashi
1-1, Nishimachi Nishi
Chiryu city, Aichi pref. / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/22]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/05]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114848.729.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998023031231.07.1998         Original published format: JP 23031298
JP1999014065020.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14065099
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976591
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976591
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60G15/07, F16F1/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugradaufhängung[2000/05]
English:Vehicle wheel suspension[2000/05]
French:Suspension de roue de véhicule[2000/05]
Examination procedure29.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
21.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2003Fee for grant paid
07.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Deutschen Federnindustrie
Goldene Pforte 1
58093 Hagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Gartenstrasse 61
58636 Iserlohn / DE
 02  04.03.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Ikuo SAKAI
52-7-406, Aramotokita, Higashiosaka-shi
Osaka 577-0011 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Strasse 20
81829 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/11]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Deutschen Federnindustrie
Goldene Pforte 1
58093 Hagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Patentanwalt Stefanstrasse 2 Kirchhoffgebäude
D-58638 Iserlohn / DE
 02  04.03.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Ikuo SAKAI
52-7-406, Aramotokita, Higashiosaka-shi
Osaka 577-0011 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2004/19]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Deutschen Federnindustrie
Goldene Pforte 1
58093 Hagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Schröter & Haverkamp, Patentanwälte, Im Tückwinkel 22
58636 Iserlohn / DE
 02  04.03.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Ikuo SAKAI
52-7-406, Aramotokita, Higashiosaka-shi
Osaka 577-0011 / JP
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2004/18]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2004  17.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Verband der Deutschen Federnindustrie
Goldene Pforte 1
58093 Hagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Haverkamp, Jens
Schröter & Haverkamp, Patentanwälte, Im Tückwinkel 22
58636 Iserlohn / DE
22.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.07.2005Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
11.03.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/26]
13.05.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.01.2012Appeal received No.  T0177/12
17.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2015Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
01.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0177/12
29.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2015Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
28.04.2006Appeal received No.  T0702/06
03.07.2006Statement of grounds filed
12.09.2008Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
12.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.09.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
11.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB1198713  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2,4-6,8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4903985  (MUHR KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1,4,5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0791491  (METALLURG DE SAINT URBAIN AMSU [FR]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08142622  ;
 [A]EP0526689  (BRUENINGHAUS KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 1-5,8 *;
 [A]FR2742830  (ACE ENGINEERING [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4203658  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 55 *;
 [A]FR2540586  (RESSORTS IND [FR]) [A] 1,4 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0728602  (ALLEVARD SA [FR]) [A] 1,4,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, [A] 1,2,8 * abstract *
by applicantJPS4839290U
 GB1198713
 JP2642163B
 US4903985