Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978522

EP0978522 - Associative thickeners for aqueous systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663 Wilmington
Delaware 19803-7663 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
P.O. Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kukkala, Pravin K.
9909 White Blossum Boulevard
Louisville Kentucky 40241 / US
02 / Kielbania, Andrew J., Jr.
123 Peggy Lane
Chalfont, Pennsylvania 18914 / US
03 / Verstrat, Daniel W.
9220 Hopi Trail
Ooltewah, Tennessee 37363 / US
04 / Montague, Peter G.
199 Palisades Drive
Signal Mountain, Tennessee 37377 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Held, Stephan , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114927.930.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998012999006.08.1998         Original published format: US 129990
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978522
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/10, C08G18/12, C08G18/50, C09D7/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Assoziative Bindemittel für wässrige Systeme[2000/06]
English:Associative thickeners for aqueous systems[2000/06]
French:Agents épaississants associatifs en milieu aqueux[2000/06]
Examination procedure28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
10.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0314816  (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 13,14 * page 2, line 42 - line 54 * * examples 3,4 *;
 [A]US5612408  (KOENIG KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1,16-19,25 * page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 18 * * column 7 - column 8; examples 1,1A *;
 [A]US5281654  (EISENHART ERIC K [US], et al) [A] 1,20-22,25 * examples 1,13,18 *;
 [A]US5496908  (BOSTROM PETER [SE], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8,16-19,25 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 64 * * example 1; table 1 *;
 [DA]US4079028  (EMMONS WILLIAM D, et al) [DA] 1,16-19,23,25 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 44 * * examples 154,155,273; table 16 *