Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979978

EP0979978 - Portable air conditioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/07]Portable air conditioner
[2005/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2005/49]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
BSH Fabricacion, S.A.
Factoria Esquiroz, Camino de Mendi, s/n
31191 Esquiroz (Navarra) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Arraiza, Jaime
c/M de urdax 19
31011 Pamplona / ES
02 / Barcos, Jesus
c/P Inmaculada 33
Estella (Navarra) / ES
03 / Gonzales, Juan
C/Labiano 7
31011 Pamplona / ES
04 / Schmülling, Ralf
Windmüllerkamp 7
59269 Beckum / DE
05 / Geyer, Johannes
Kellerstrasse 31
81667 München / DE
[2000/14]
Former [2000/07]01 / Arraiza, Jaime
c/M de urdax 19
31011 Pamplona / ES
02 / Barcos, Jesus
c/P Inmaculada 33
Estella (Navarra) / ES
03 / Gonzales, Juan
C/Labiano 7
31011 Pamplona / ES
04 / Schmülling, Ralf
c/Concepcion Benitez 4
31011 Pamplona / ES
05 / Geyer, Johannes
Kellerstrasse 31
81667 München / DE
Representative(s)Thoma, Lorenz
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Thoma, Lorenz
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114952.730.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateES1998000174813.08.1998         Original published format: ES 9801748
[2000/07]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979978
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979978
Date:07.11.2001
[2001/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979978
Date:22.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/02, F24F13/20
[2001/45]
Former International [2000/07]F24F1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/30]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Transportables Klimagerät[2005/41]
English:Portable air conditioning device[2005/41]
French:Appareil de climatisation transportable[2000/07]
Former [2000/07]Transportable Klimaanlage
Former [2000/07]Portable air conditioner
Examination procedure07.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/28]
23.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2006Fee for grant paid
23.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19609600  (DELCHI CARRIER SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3802216  (BRANDIMARTE A) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4733542  (BLAIR ROBERT R [US])