Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977316

EP0977316 - Two piece male electrical contact with polarizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / SG / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / SG / CH
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.
100 Endicott Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Walker, Richard P.
Rd#1, Maple Drive
Saegertown, Pennsylvania 16433 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114974.130.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS19980094678P30.07.1998         Original published format: US 94678 P
US1999032873909.06.1999         Original published format: US 328739
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977316
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977316
Date:16.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweiteiliger elektrischer Steckverbinder mit Polarisator[2000/05]
English:Two piece male electrical contact with polarizer[2000/05]
French:Connecteur électrique mâle à deux pièces polarisé[2000/05]
Examination procedure13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
28.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2001Fee for grant paid
17.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.01.2002
NL16.01.2002
[2003/06]
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0952631  (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US5897405  (ENDO HIROSHI [US]) [PA] 1-5 * column W *;
 [A]US5271741  (SAITO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5158485  (SAITO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *