Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976928

EP0976928 - Blade assembly for turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2005  [2005/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DLR Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
53175 Bonn / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Bechert, Dietrich, Dr.-Ing.
Goethestrasse 69
10625 Berlin / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114975.830.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813464731.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834647
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976928
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976928
Date:19.09.2001
[2001/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976928
Date:25.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/32, F04D29/16
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [2002/23]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaufelanordnung für eine Strömungsmaschine[2000/05]
English:Blade assembly for turbomachine[2000/05]
French:Ensemble de pale pour turbomachine[2000/05]
Examination procedure20.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/11]
19.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT
16.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
22.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2004Fee for grant paid
28.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3193185  (ERWIN JOHN R, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3908285  (DAIMLER-BENZ AG) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4023350  (HOVAN EDWARD JOHN, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 10-46 *;
 [A]US2920864  (LEE JOHN G) [A] * column 1, lines 15-25; figures 5-9 *;
 [A]JPH094402
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *