Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978339

EP0978339 - Device for cutting profiles for windows or doors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]Milling device for recesses on window profiles
[2004/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eisenbach, Bernhard
Taunusstrasse 24
65611 Brechen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Eisenbach, Bernhard
Taunusstrasse 24
D-65611 Brechen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Müller, Eckhard
Mühlstrasse 9a
65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
[2008/44]
Former [2000/06]Müller, Eckhard, Dr.
Eifelstrasse 14
65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
Application number, filing date99114992.331.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813521004.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835210
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978339
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978339
Date:04.12.2002
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978339
Date:25.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23C3/12, B23C3/28
[2002/35]
Former International [2000/06]B23C3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2003/35]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Zuschneiden von Profilstücken für Fenster oder Türen[2004/51]
English:Device for cutting profiles for windows or doors[2004/51]
French:Dispositif de coupe des profilés de fenêtres ou portes[2004/51]
Former [2000/06]Vorrichtung zum Fräsen von Aussparungen an Fensterprofilen
Former [2000/06]Milling device for recesses on window profiles
Former [2000/06]Dispositif de fraisage d' évidements à des profilés de fenêtres
Examination procedure19.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
05.06.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
23.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2005Fee for grant paid
16.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Request for further processing for:23.03.2004Request for further processing filed
23.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]DE19828030  (LUTZ EUGEN MASCH [DE]) [E] 1 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-13 *;
 [XA]DE3027459  (EISENBACH BERNHARDT) [X] 1-3 * page 10, line 13 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-6 * [A] 4;
 [A]DE3107396  (EISENBACH BERNHARD) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 20; figure 4 *