Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979664

EP0979664 - Atrial fixation/stimulation loop [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - applicantpublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Centrral Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Medtronic Inc.
7000 Central Avenue Northeast
Minneapolis, MN 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rutten, Jean Joseph Gerardus
Persoonstraat 21
6351EP Bocholtz / NL
02 / Minteb, Jaak M.O.
Pellenstraat 7
B-3400 Landen / BE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99115005.330.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013190210.08.1998         Original published format: US 131902
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979664
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979664
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2001/22]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drahtschleife zur Halterung und Reizung des Vorhofes[2000/07]
English:Atrial fixation/stimulation loop[2000/07]
French:Boucle de fixation et de stimulation auriculaire[2000/07]
Examination procedure12.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
13.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE
30.07.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8002801  (REENSTIERNA B) [A] 1-3,9 * page 2, line 2 - page 7, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]EP0788808  (CARDIAC CONTROL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,9 * page 4, column 5, line 61 - page 7, column 11, line 1; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE9209100U  (NITSCH JOBST PROF DR MED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 35; figure - *;
 [AD]US5628778  (KRUSE IB M [SE], et al) [AD] 1,3 * column 4, line 7 - line 62; figure - *;
 [A]EP0601338  (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [A] 1-3,9 * page 2, column 2, line 37 - page 4, column 5, line 17; figure - *
by applicantUS5628778
 US4154247